Senate | 03/30/2022 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | introduced in House |