House | 03/14/2022 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | introduced in House |