Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 213)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 22-15
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 52-46
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 22-14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3) and (1-title) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
returned to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
taken from Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 51-46 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
floor amendments (19), (20), (21), (22), (23), (24), (25), (26), (27), (28), (29), (30), (31), (32), (33),filed to the Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
floor amendments (14), (15), (16), (17) and (18) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
reassigned to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
floor amendment (13) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
floor amendment (12) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
floor amendment (11) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
floor amendments (8), (9) and (10) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
floor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4), (5), (6) and (7) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|