House
|
03/29/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 46)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 90-0
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
|
|
|