House | 03/07/2022 | adopted by voice vote | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | to House Floor | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | introduced in House |