Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 85)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 94-2
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
to Health & Family Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 30-2 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 07, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
to Health & Welfare (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|