Senate | 03/24/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 25) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 85-0 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Floor Amendment (1) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 07, 2022 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | introduced in Senate |