Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 20)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 94-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 08, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
to Health & Family Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 30-2 with Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 18, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
to Health & Welfare (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
|
|
|