House
|
04/14/2022
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 218)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 80-8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 32-4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
passed 38-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 94-2 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 17, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
to Transportation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 14, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
to Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|