Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 153)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 36-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1), Committee Amendment (1-title) and Floor Amendments (1) and (2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendments (1) and (2), Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 80-14 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendments (1) and (2), and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (2) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
returned to Transportation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
taken from Transportation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
to Transportation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 22, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
to Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|