Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 229)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
taken from Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
to State Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 22, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
to Health & Welfare (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|