Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 26)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 93-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
to Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 34-0-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
reassigned to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|