House | 03/25/2022 | floor amendments (4), (5) and (6-title) filed | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2022 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | reported favorably, to Rules | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | floor amendments (1), (2-title) and (3) filed | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | 2nd reading | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | returned to Education (H) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | taken from Education (H) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 28-8 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 24, 2022 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | to Education (S) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | introduced in Senate |