Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 117)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 92-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
to Health & Family Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 31-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 04, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
to Health & Welfare (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|