House | 03/01/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 28-7 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | introduced in Senate |