Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 120)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
passed 29-6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 73-22 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
taken from Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 26-5 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|