House
|
04/14/2022
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 220)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 75-18
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 28-8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 29-7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 82-13 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 34-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|