Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 152)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 36-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
to State Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 31-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 04, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|