House
|
04/14/2022
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 219)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 71-18
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 28-9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 35-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Free Conference Committee Report (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 83-10
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1), Committee Amendment (1-title) and Floor Amendments (1) and (2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute (1), floor amendments (1), (2), and committee amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
taken from Rules (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendments (1) and (2), and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendments (1) and (2), Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 87-6 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendments (1) and (2), and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 22-10 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|