Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 146)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 35-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 30-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|