Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
passed 17-8 with Committee Substitute and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 84-9 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
taken from Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
floor amendments (1) and (2) filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
returned to State Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
taken from State Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
to State Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
passed 31-2 with Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
floor amendments (6) and (2) defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
floor amendments (1) (4) (3) and (5) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
floor amendments (1) and (4) ruled out of order
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 10, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
floor amendments (2) (3) (5) and (6) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
floor amendments (1) and (4) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
returned to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
taken from Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|