Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 52)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 95-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
to Small Business & Information Technology (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|