Senate | 03/30/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 55) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | introduced in Senate |