House | 04/13/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 32-4 with Floor Amendments (1) and (2) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | floor amendment (2) filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 26, 2022 | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | introduced in Senate |