Senate | 03/23/2022 | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | introduced in Senate |