House | 03/24/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | passed 23-14 with Floor Amendment (2) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | floor amendment (1) withdrawn | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | floor amendment (2) filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 01/08/2022 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | introduced in Senate |