Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 150)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 36-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 71-24 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
reassigned to Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
to Agriculture (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 07, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2022
|
to Agriculture (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|