Senate | 03/25/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 33) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | to Health & Family Services (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | to Health & Welfare (S) | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | introduced in Senate |