House
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 72-20 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
taken from the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|