Senate | 03/09/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 12) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 89-2 | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 03, 2022 | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | returned to Education (S) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | taken from Education (S) | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | to Education (S) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | introduced in Senate |