Senate | 03/17/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 17) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Floor Amendment (1) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 01/08/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/08/2022 | introduced in Senate |