House | 03/29/2022 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (3-title) filed to bill | ||
House | 03/25/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | to Health & Family Services (H) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 29-8 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | to Health & Welfare (S) | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | introduced in Senate |