Senate | 03/30/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 53) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | to Transportation (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | passed 34-0 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | floor amendment (1) withdrawn | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 14, 2022 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | to Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | introduced in Senate |