Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 187)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 33-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, adopted 85-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
to Transportation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
3rd reading, adopted 32-0 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1), and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
to Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|