House
|
04/04/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 169)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
returned to Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
taken from Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
to Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 02, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|