Senate | 03/07/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | to Agriculture (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | introduced in House |