House
|
04/07/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 187)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
returned to Families & Children (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
taken from Families & Children (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
to Families & Children (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
to Health Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|