House | 03/16/2023 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | taken from Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | floor amendment (2) filed | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | introduced in House |