LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kentucky KY
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB133
Action History
KY
Kentucky House Bill HB133
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HB133
Action History
House
02/22/2023
recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
House
02/15/2023
2nd reading, to Rules
House
02/14/2023
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
House
02/09/2023
to Education (H)
House
01/06/2023
to Committee on Committees (H)
House
01/06/2023
introduced in House