House
|
03/29/2023
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 126)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
returned to Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
taken from Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
to Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 81-13 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
returned to Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
taken from Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
to Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|