House
|
03/23/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 80)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
passed 94-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 36 -0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 98-2 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|