House
|
03/28/2023
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 117)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 27 -9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 78-19
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|