House | 03/21/2023 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 44) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | passed 75-16 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House concurred in Senate Floor Amendment (1) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Floor Amendment (1) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | to Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Floor Amendment (1) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | introduced in House |