House | 03/16/2023 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | taken from Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | introduced in House |