Senate | 03/13/2023 | to Education (S) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | introduced in House |