House | 02/15/2023 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 2) | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | reported favorably, to Rules | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/05/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/05/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | placed in the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | taken from Rules | ||
Senate | 01/05/2023 | 1st reading | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | returned to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | taken from Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | introduced in House |