House
|
03/22/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 58)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 99-0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|