Senate | 03/29/2023 | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | returned to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | taken from Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | introduced in House |