House
|
03/24/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 94)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
passed 32 -5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
floor amendment (1) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 13, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 77-17 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 02, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
introduced in House
|
|
|