Senate | 03/15/2023 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | introduced in House |